+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On February 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On January 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On January 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (January 6). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
- Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
On May 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On May 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On May 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
On April 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On April 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On April 2, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
On March 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and REV. & TAX.
On February 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 8.
On February 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
January 6, 2014: Be referred to Committee on Public Safety.
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 1
April 16, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Revenue and Taxation.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor