+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (23)
On September 23, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 521, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 7, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
On August 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 70. Noes 5. Page 6401.).
On August 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 5271.).
On August 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 29).
On June 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
On May 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On May 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On May 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 4. Page 4779.)
On May 9, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 5, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 4).
On April 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On April 26, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
On March 3, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
On February 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 29, 2016: AB 2316 O'DONNELL Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 5
August 23, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2316 O'Donnell By Leyva
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 1
June 29, 2016: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 9
May 12, 2016: AB 2316 O'DONNELL Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 66
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 10
May 4, 2016: Do pass.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor