+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On August 28, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 237, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 13, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6242.).
On August 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5233.).
On July 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 13).
On May 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 10, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5120.)
On May 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 2, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 2).
On April 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 4, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 3).
On March 1, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
On February 13, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 13, 2018: AB 2316 EGGMAN Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
August 9, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2316 Eggman By Nguyen
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 3
June 13, 2018: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
May 10, 2018: AB 2316 EGGMAN Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 73
- Present/NV: 5
May 2, 2018: Do pass.
- Yeas: 17
April 3, 2018: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 15
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor