+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (28)
On November 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On August 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On June 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On June 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
On June 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on B. & F.I. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 27).
On June 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On June 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and B. & F.I.
On May 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4990.)
On May 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 19).
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On May 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
On May 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 2, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 28, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 26).
On April 21, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on J.,E.D., & E.
On April 20, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on J.,E.D., & E. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 18).
On March 28, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Coms. on B. & F. and J.,E.D., & E. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
- Re-referred to Com. on J.,E.D., & E.
On March 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J.,E.D., & E. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Coms. on J.,E.D., & E. and B. & F.
On February 17, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (6)
August 1, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 27, 2022: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Banking and Financial Institutions]
- Yeas: 14
May 25, 2022: AB 2314 Petrie-Norris Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 2
May 19, 2022: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 4
April 26, 2022: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
April 18, 2022: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Jobs, Economic Development, and the Economy]
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor