+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (26)
On September 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 712, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 6, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6851.).
On August 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5781.).
On August 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16).
On July 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 12).
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 4645.)
On April 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 4, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 4).
On March 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 13, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On March 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
On March 1, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On February 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
On February 13, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 29, 2018: AB 2313 STONE Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 80
August 27, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2313 Mark Stone By Wiener
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
August 16, 2018: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
July 2, 2018: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 12, 2018: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 12, 2018: AB 2313 STONE Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 68
- Present/NV: 9
April 4, 2018: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 2
March 20, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor