+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On November 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On August 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On June 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5271.)
On May 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 23).
On May 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On February 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 4, 2014: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 7
June 24, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
May 28, 2014: AB 2311 BRADFORD Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 73
- Present/NV: 6
May 23, 2014: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 5
April 29, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor