+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On January 21, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
On October 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On September 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3478.).
On September 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On September 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2827.).
On September 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30).
On July 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 28, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2016.)
On May 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16).
On May 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 29, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 23).
On March 27, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
On March 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D., & E. Read second time and amended.
On March 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
On December 4, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee January 3.
On December 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
September 12, 2019: AB 23 Burke Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 79
September 11, 2019: Assembly 3rd Reading AB23 Burke By Allen
- Yeas: 40
August 30, 2019: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
July 1, 2019: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 17, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
May 28, 2019: AB 23 Burke Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
May 16, 2019: Do pass.
- Yeas: 18
April 23, 2019: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor