+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 37, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On June 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:15 a.m.
On June 9, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5304.).
On June 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On June 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4176.).
On May 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On May 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 10).
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 7, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4230.)
On April 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 5, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 5).
On March 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
On March 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
On February 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
June 9, 2016: AB 2295 BAKER Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 6
June 6, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2295 Baker By Glazer
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 8
April 7, 2016: AB 2295 BAKER Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 3
April 5, 2016: Do pass.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor