+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (23)
On September 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 569, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 7, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
On August 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 27. Page 6356.).
On August 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 14. Page 5268.).
On August 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11).
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 8).
On May 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On May 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 4782.)
On May 10, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 9, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On May 5, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 6.) (May 4).
On April 20, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On February 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
On February 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 29, 2016: AB 2294 GOMEZ Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 27
- Present/NV: 1
August 23, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2294 Gomez By Allen
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 14
August 11, 2016: Do pass
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
August 1, 2016: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 8, 2016: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
May 12, 2016: AB 2294 GOMEZ Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 26
- Present/NV: 3
May 4, 2016: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 6
April 19, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor