+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On September 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On August 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5281.).
On August 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On August 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5415.)
On May 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 25).
On April 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 2, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
On March 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 13, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
On March 1, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
On February 13, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 13, 2018: Consent Calendar AB2294
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
June 26, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
May 29, 2018: AB 2294 OBERNOLTE Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 78
May 25, 2018: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
April 3, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor