+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On July 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 96, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On July 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:15 p.m.
On June 26, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On June 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4147.).
On June 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On June 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 10).
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 5, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4753.)
On April 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 29).
On April 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD.
On February 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
June 26, 2014: Special Consent #17 AB2288 Roger Hernández
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 8
May 5, 2014: AB 2288 HERNÁNDEZ Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 3
April 29, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 10
April 23, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor