+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (38)
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Died on Senate inactive file.
On August 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file pursuant to Senate Rule 29.
On August 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On August 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11).
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- (pending re-refer to Com. on APPR.)
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4861.)
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4861.)
On August 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On August 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On June 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Withdrawn from committee.
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On June 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and T. & H.
On June 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 5239.)
On June 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On May 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 6.) (May 27).
On May 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 26, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (April 21).
On April 20, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
On April 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4389.)
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4389.)
- (pending re-refer to Com. on B. & F.)
On April 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
- Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On April 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
On April 5, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On April 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
On March 3, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
On February 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
On February 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 11, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
August 11, 2016: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 2, 2016: AB 2282 CALDERON Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 4
May 27, 2016: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 6
April 21, 2016: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
April 20, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Banking and Finance]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor