+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On September 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 57. Noes 19. Page 6592.).
On August 25, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 7. Page 4762.).
On August 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On August 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 14).
On August 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On June 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On May 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F.
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 12. Page 4838.)
On May 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (April 30).
On April 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 2).
On March 26, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On March 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
On February 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (10)
August 27, 2014: AB 2280 ALEJO Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 3
August 22, 2014: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2280 Alejo By Lara
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 8
August 14, 2014: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
August 4, 2014: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 7
June 25, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
June 10, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Governance and Finance.
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
May 8, 2014: AB 2280 ALEJO Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 10
April 30, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
April 2, 2014: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
March 26, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Local Government.
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor