+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On November 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On April 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 9, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On March 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and H. & C.D.
On February 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
On February 13, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor