+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On September 27, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 587, Statutes of 2022.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 4980.).
On August 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On August 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
On June 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On June 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and APPR.
On May 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 9, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 0. Page 4605.)
On April 4, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On March 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On March 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 29).
On March 28, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
On March 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 17, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (5)
+ − Votes (6)
August 23, 2022: Special Consent AB2274
- Yeas: 40
August 11, 2022: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
June 27, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
June 14, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
May 9, 2022: AB 2274 Blanca Rubio Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 66
- Present/NV: 12
March 29, 2022: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Blanca Rubio
Type:
Primary Sponsor