+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (26)
On September 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 320, Statutes of 2022.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 2, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0.).
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On August 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 5235.).
On August 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 11).
On August 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On June 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 28).
On June 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 26, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0.)
On May 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 19).
On May 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
On April 27, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 26, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 19).
On March 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on P. & C.P.
On February 17, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (8)
August 30, 2022: AB 2273 Wicks Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 5
August 30, 2022: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2273 Wicks et al. By Newman
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 7
August 11, 2022: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
August 1, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 28, 2022: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
May 26, 2022: AB 2273 Wicks Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 72
- Present/NV: 6
May 19, 2022: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
April 19, 2022: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1