+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On July 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 100, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On July 10, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On July 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On July 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5043.).
On June 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 25).
On June 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4899.)
On April 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 18).
On April 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 1, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On February 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
On February 13, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
July 2, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2270 McCarty et al. By Pan
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 2
June 25, 2018: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
June 12, 2018: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 2
April 26, 2018: AB 2270 MCCARTY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 4
April 18, 2018: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 2
April 4, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 21
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor