+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On September 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On September 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4932.).
On August 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- From inactive file.
On August 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator DeSaulnier.
- From consent calendar.
On August 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On August 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On June 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on T. & H.
On May 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5112.)
On May 15, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On May 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 14).
On April 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
On March 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
On February 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 28, 2014: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2270 Ting By DeSaulnier
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 6
June 24, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent.
- Yeas: 11
May 23, 2014: AB 2270 TING Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 73
- Present/NV: 6
May 14, 2014: Do pass, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
April 29, 2014: Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 14
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor