+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (26)
On September 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 568, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 23, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6113.).
On August 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5025.).
On August 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
On August 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On August 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28).
On June 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 4498.)
On April 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4455.)
On April 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From Consent Calendar.
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 13).
On March 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On March 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 29).
On March 3, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
On February 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 23, 2016: AB 2269 WALDRON Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
August 16, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2269 Waldron By Monning
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 1
August 11, 2016: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
August 8, 2016: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 28, 2016: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
April 25, 2016: AB 2269 WALDRON Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
April 13, 2016: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 20
March 29, 2016: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10