+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On November 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On May 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On April 27, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
On April 7, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 6, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 5).
On March 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On March 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 29).
On March 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and JUD.
On February 17, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
On February 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Votes (2)
April 5, 2022: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
March 29, 2022: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor