+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On July 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 104, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On July 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On June 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On June 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4643.).
On June 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 8).
On May 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On May 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 5, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 4689.)
On April 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 27).
On March 3, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on E. & R.
On February 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
On February 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
June 30, 2016: Consent Calendar 2nd AB2265 Mark Stone
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
June 8, 2016: Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 5
May 5, 2016: AB 2265 STONE Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
April 27, 2016: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor