+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (29)
On September 4, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 38, Statutes of 2020.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 1, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:15 p.m.
On August 31, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5495.).
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On August 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.).
On August 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 20).
On August 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On August 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 5).
On July 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
On June 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 11, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 4831.).
On June 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 4, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On June 3, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 3).
On June 2, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 21, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 7, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
On May 6, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
On May 5, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
On May 4, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
On April 24, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on L. & E.
On February 14, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
On February 13, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 31, 2020: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2257 Gonzalez et al. By Jackson Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
August 31, 2020: AB 2257 Gonzalez Concurrence - Urgency Added
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 5
August 17, 2020: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
August 5, 2020: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
June 11, 2020: AB 2257 Gonzalez Third Reading Urgency
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 2
June 3, 2020: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 18
May 20, 2020: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor