+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On November 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On May 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On May 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 26, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 19).
On April 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On April 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
On April 5, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 3, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
On February 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Vote
April 19, 2016: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 17
- Present/NV: 2