+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On September 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 500, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 4, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6289.).
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6285.)
On August 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4647.).
On August 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 24).
On May 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on T. & H.
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 15, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4970.)
On May 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On May 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 7).
On April 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 21).
On March 25, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On March 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
On March 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On February 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 21, 2014: AB 2250 DALY Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 79
August 20, 2014: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2250 Daly By DeSaulnier
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 8
June 24, 2014: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 11
May 15, 2014: AB 2250 DALY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
May 7, 2014: Do pass, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
April 21, 2014: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor