+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On November 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Died on inactive file.
On August 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to inactive file by unanimous consent.
- Reconsideration granted. (Page 5854.)
On May 10, 2016 in the Assembly:
- through August 17 Motion to reconsider continued.
On May 9, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Ridley-Thomas.
- Read third time. Urgency clause refused adoption. (Ayes 51. Noes 0. Page 4726.)
On April 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 13).
On March 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (March 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 3, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on E. & R.
On February 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
On February 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
May 9, 2016: AB 2250 RIDLEY-THOMAS Third Reading Urgency
- Yeas: 51
- Present/NV: 29
May 9, 2016: AB 2250 RIDLEY-THOMAS Third Reading Urgency Amend By HARPER Set #1 Motion to Lay on the Table By CALDERON
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 26
- Present/NV: 3
April 13, 2016: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 4
March 30, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor