+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On September 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 899, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 10. Page 4494.).
On July 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 13. Page 4474.)
On April 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 9, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (April 9).
On April 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 14, 2014: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2243 Weber By Block
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 8
June 17, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
April 21, 2014: AB 2243 WEBER Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 7
April 9, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 4
April 1, 2014: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor