+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (34)
On September 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 813, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6679.).
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6667.)
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4932.).
On August 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Return to Senate floor for consideration. (Ayes 3. Noes 0.) (August 27).
- Ordered to third reading.
On August 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10.
On August 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14).
On August 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On June 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5230.)
On May 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 23).
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 5065.)
On May 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On May 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
On April 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On April 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
On April 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On March 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On February 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time.
On February 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 25.
On February 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Introduced. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 28, 2014: AB 2236 MAIENSCHEIN Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 3
August 28, 2014: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2236 Maienschein By Beall
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 6
August 27, 2014: From Committee: Amendments returned to Senate floor for consideration.
- Yeas: 3
- Present/NV: 2
August 4, 2014: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 7
June 24, 2014: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
May 28, 2014: AB 2236 MAIENSCHEIN Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
May 23, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
April 29, 2014: Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 7