+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On November 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On June 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On June 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4726.)
On June 3, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 2, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 2).
On May 22, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (May 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On February 20, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on B. & P.
On February 14, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
On February 13, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
June 8, 2020: AB 2232 Grayson Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 3
June 2, 2020: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 18
May 21, 2020: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 19
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor