+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (25)
On September 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 823, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 7, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
On August 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6390.).
On August 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5305.).
On August 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On August 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On June 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5031.)
On May 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 27).
On May 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 7, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On April 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
On March 3, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On February 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
On February 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 29, 2016: AB 2231 CALDERON Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
August 23, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2231 Calderon By McGuire
- Yeas: 39
August 11, 2016: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
August 1, 2016: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 28, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
May 31, 2016: AB 2231 CALDERON Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 5
May 27, 2016: Do pass.
- Yeas: 20
April 12, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor