+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 1, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On January 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
On May 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On April 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On March 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On March 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
On March 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On March 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
On March 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (February 28). Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On February 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and HUM. S.
On January 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 26.
On January 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
March 21, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
February 28, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7