+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
On April 20, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage.
On April 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
On March 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
On February 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
April 12, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 5
April 12, 2016: Reconsideration.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor