+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (27)
On September 26, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 641, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 7, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
On August 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6354.).
On August 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5267.).
On August 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On August 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 11).
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On May 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4870.)
On May 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On May 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 11).
On April 20, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 12).
On April 7, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On April 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
On March 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On March 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
On February 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 29, 2016: AB 2221 GARCIA, C. Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 80
August 23, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2221 Cristina Garcia By McGuire
- Yeas: 39
August 11, 2016: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
August 1, 2016: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 21, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
May 19, 2016: AB 2221 GARCIA, C. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
May 11, 2016: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 20
April 12, 2016: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor