+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (10)
+ − Actions (33)
On September 28, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 650, Statutes of 2022.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 12, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 0.).
On August 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
On August 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 5197.).
On August 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On August 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 29).
On June 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On June 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HOUSING.
On June 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on HOUSING and GOV. & F.
On May 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4920.)
On May 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18).
On May 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 2, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 28, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 27).
On April 13, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 6, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On March 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On March 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
On March 7, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On March 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
On February 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
On February 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (7)
+ − Votes (8)
August 30, 2022: AB 2221 Quirk-Silva Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 6
August 29, 2022: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2221 Quirk-Silva By Wieckowski
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
June 29, 2022: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
June 13, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
May 25, 2022: AB 2221 Quirk-Silva Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 4
May 18, 2022: Do pass.
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 1
April 27, 2022: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1
April 5, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government]
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor