+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 5, 2024 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 24, 2024 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 23, 2024 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 9. Page 5608.)
On April 10, 2024 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 9, 2024 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (April 9).
On April 3, 2024 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 19, 2024 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 18, 2024 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
On February 8, 2024 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 9.
On February 7, 2024 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 23, 2024: AB 2216 Haney Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 25
April 9, 2024: Do pass.
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor