+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On November 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On August 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Held under submission.
On July 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On June 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 22).
On June 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 1721.).
On May 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 20).
On April 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 5, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On March 30, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
On January 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On January 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee February 11.
On January 11, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (5)
+ − Votes (5)
July 15, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 22, 2021: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
June 1, 2021: AB 221 Santiago Third Reading Urgency
- Yeas: 71
- Present/NV: 8
May 20, 2021: Do pass.
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 2
April 7, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor