+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On September 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 499, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
On August 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6103.).
On August 13, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4458.).
On August 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 18).
On June 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
On June 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
On May 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5112.)
On May 15, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On May 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 14).
On May 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 5, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On May 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 28).
On March 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on B. & F.
On February 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
On February 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 18, 2014: AB 2209 DICKINSON Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
August 13, 2014: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2209 Dickinson By Evans
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
June 18, 2014: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 9
May 23, 2014: AB 2209 DICKINSON Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 73
- Present/NV: 6
May 14, 2014: Do pass, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
April 28, 2014: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor