+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On September 9, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 264, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 22, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5008.).
On June 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On June 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4595.)
On April 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 20, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 20).
On April 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 3, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On February 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
On February 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
August 16, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2201 Brough By Berryhill
- Yeas: 39
June 8, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
April 28, 2016: AB 2201 BROUGH Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
April 20, 2016: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 4
April 11, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor