+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On August 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 165, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On July 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On July 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1793.).
On July 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On June 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 22).
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1108.)
On April 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 15).
On April 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (March 25).
On February 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 6.
On February 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
July 6, 2015: Special Consent #4 AB220 Holden
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
June 22, 2015: Do pass
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
June 10, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
June 10, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
April 23, 2015: AB 220 HOLDEN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
April 23, 2015: AB 220 HOLDEN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
April 15, 2015: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
March 25, 2015: Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
March 25, 2015: Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor