+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On September 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 468, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m.
On August 12, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4412.).
On May 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 13).
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On April 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4429.)
On April 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On April 2, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 1).
On March 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
On February 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
August 11, 2014: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2199 Muratsuchi By Block
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
May 13, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 10, 2014: AB 2199 MURATSUCHI Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 5
April 1, 2014: Do pass, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor