+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On November 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee without further action.
On May 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
On May 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 24, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (April 21).
On April 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On April 10, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
On March 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On February 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
On February 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Vote
April 21, 2014: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5