+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On September 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Vetoed by Governor.
On August 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 23, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On August 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 5219.).
On August 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11).
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
On June 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 5187.)
On June 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On May 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 6.) (May 27).
On May 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 20, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (April 20).
On March 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on INS.
On March 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended.
On March 3, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on INS.
On February 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
On February 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 22, 2016: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2197 Cristina Garcia By Mitchell
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 1
August 11, 2016: Do pass
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
August 1, 2016: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 22, 2016: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
June 2, 2016: AB 2197 GARCIA, C. Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 27
- Present/NV: 2
May 27, 2016: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 6
April 20, 2016: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor