+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On September 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 381, Statutes of 2016.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:45 a.m.
On August 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5874.).
On August 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 15).
On August 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
On June 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On June 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4645.).
On June 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On June 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 14).
On June 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On May 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on T. & H.
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 5, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 4689.)
On April 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
On April 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 27).
On April 5, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On March 3, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and L. GOV.
On February 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
On February 18, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 18, 2016: AB 2196 LOW Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
August 15, 2016: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in.
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 1
June 30, 2016: Consent Calendar 2nd AB2196 Low
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
June 14, 2016: Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 11
May 5, 2016: AB 2196 LOW Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
April 27, 2016: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 9
April 4, 2016: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 16
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor