+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (24)
On September 13, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 371, Statutes of 2018.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 28, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 57. Noes 22. Page 6498.).
On August 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 5444.).
On August 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 6).
On June 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 20).
On June 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on EQ.
On May 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 23. Page 5410.)
On May 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 25).
On May 2, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 24, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On April 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
On March 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On March 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
- Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On February 13, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
On February 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 23, 2018: AB 2195 CHAU Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 1
August 20, 2018: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2195 Chau et al. By Stern
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 1
June 20, 2018: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 29, 2018: AB 2195 CHAU Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 3
May 25, 2018: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
April 23, 2018: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor