+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On November 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From Senate committee without further action.
On June 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on T. & H.
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 28, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 4. Page 5225.)
On May 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 5096.)
On May 12, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 7).
On March 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On February 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
On February 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
May 28, 2014: AB 2192 MELENDEZ Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 72
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 3
May 7, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor