+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (25)
On October 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 739, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 2834.).
On September 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 13. Page 2349.).
On August 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On August 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (August 27).
On July 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
On June 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 27. Page 1862.)
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28).
On May 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, second hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
On April 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
On March 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On February 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on L. & E.
On February 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 5.
On February 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
September 3, 2015: AB 219 DALY Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 27
- Present/NV: 2
September 1, 2015: Assembly 3rd Reading AB219 Daly By Mendoza
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 3
July 6, 2015: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 24, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
June 24, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
June 3, 2015: AB 219 DALY Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 27
- Present/NV: 1
May 28, 2015: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 5
April 22, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
April 22, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor