+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (25)
On October 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 661, Statutes of 2013.
On October 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On September 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 65. Noes 11. Page 3094.).
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.)
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.)
On September 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On September 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 2257.).
On September 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On August 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (August 12).
On July 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 26).
On June 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On April 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 9. Page 1039.)
On April 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 17, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 17).
On April 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 2.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On February 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 7.
On February 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
September 10, 2013: AB 219 PEREA Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 2
September 9, 2013: Assembly 3rd Reading AB219 Perea By Wright
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 1
August 12, 2013: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
June 26, 2013: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
April 22, 2013: AB 219 PEREA Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 6
April 17, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 2
April 9, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2