+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On September 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 521, Statutes of 2014.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 4, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 68. Noes 3. Page 6288.).
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6285.)
On August 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
On August 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 6. Page 4651.).
On August 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On July 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 25).
On June 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On June 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On May 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 8. Page 5163.)
On May 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 21).
On May 12, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 8, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
On May 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 5, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On May 1, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 30).
On April 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On April 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
On March 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On February 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
On February 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
August 21, 2014: AB 2188 MURATSUCHI Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 8
August 20, 2014: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2188 Muratsuchi By Wolk
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 12
June 25, 2014: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
May 27, 2014: AB 2188 MURATSUCHI Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 13
May 21, 2014: Do pass.
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 3
April 30, 2014: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor