+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (29)
On September 28, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 673, Statutes of 2022.
On September 6, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On August 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 31 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended.
- Assembly Rule 77 suspended.
- Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 18.).
On August 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 10. Page 5177.).
On August 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 11).
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- In committee: Referred to suspense file.
On June 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD.
On May 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 22. Page 4929.)
On May 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 19).
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to suspense file.
On April 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Measure version as amended on March 24 corrected.
On April 21, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 28, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
On March 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on L. & E.
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
On February 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
On February 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (7)
+ − Votes (8)
August 29, 2022: AB 2183 STONE Concurrence in Senate Amendments
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 7
August 29, 2022: Assembly 3rd Reading AB2183 Stone et al. By Durazo
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 4
August 1, 2022: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 28, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
June 22, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
May 25, 2022: AB 2183 Stone Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 7
May 19, 2022: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
April 20, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (44)
Type:
Primary Sponsor