+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On October 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 699, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 26, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On September 12, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On September 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 16. Page 2397.).
On September 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2386.)
- Motion to reconsider made by Senator De León.
- Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 20. Noes 16. Page 2385.).
On September 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30).
On August 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On July 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and JUD.
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
On May 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 29. Page 1802.)
On May 28, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 24).
On May 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On April 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended.
On April 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 2).
On February 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 7.
On February 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
September 11, 2013: Assembly 3rd Reading AB218 Dickinson By De León
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 3
September 11, 2013: Assembly 3rd Reading AB218 Dickinson By De León Reconsider
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 1
August 30, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
August 12, 2013: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
July 2, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
June 26, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary.
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
May 30, 2013: AB 218 DICKINSON Assembly Third Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 29
- Present/NV: 2
May 24, 2013: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 5
April 2, 2013: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor