+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 13, Statutes of 2022.
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:15 a.m.
- In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
On March 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 3277.).
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- Art. IV, Sec. 8(b) of the Constitution dispensed with. (Ayes 31. Noes 5. Page 3276.)
On March 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Approved by the Governor.
On March 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (March 30).
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 28, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 4041.)
- From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 28).
- Read second time and amended.
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 1. Page 4046.).
On March 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
- Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3975.)
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On February 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and H. & C.D.
On February 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
On February 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read first time. To print.
+ − Analyses (5)
+ − Votes (5)
March 31, 2022: Assembly 2nd Reading AB2179 Grayson et al. By Umberg Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
March 30, 2022: Do pass
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
March 29, 2022: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 1
March 28, 2022: AB 2179 GRAYSON Third Reading Urgency
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 13
March 28, 2022: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor